judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-512
B-512
10/12/1967
Application for Writ of Error
J. W. AIKIN, JR., ET AL.
FRANKLIN COUNTY WATER DISTRICT, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/30/1967Response to PetitionRespondent
10/13/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/02/1968Opinion issued
02/19/1968Motion for leave to file brief
01/24/1968Document received (See Remarks)
10/30/1967Response to Petition
10/13/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
10/12/1967Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dumas, Huguenin and BoothmanAmicus Curiae
J. W. Aikin, Jr., et al.Petitioner
Franklin County Water District, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information