Case: 08-87-00279-CR
08-87-00279-CR
10/19/1987
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Lowery, James Marcus
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
08/31/1990 | Shuck purged | | |
04/07/1989 | Mandate Issued | | |
04/07/1989 | Mandate Issued | | |
03/08/1989 | Case Returned from Higher Court | | |
03/08/1989 | Decision from Supreme Court or CCA | Refused | |
10/25/1988 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |
10/14/1988 | Petition for Discretionary Review | | |
09/14/1988 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | |
09/07/1988 | Motion postponed, to be heard later | | |
08/25/1988 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
08/10/1988 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
08/10/1988 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
08/05/1988 | Submitted | | |
08/05/1988 | Submission | | |
08/05/1988 | Submitted | | |
06/30/1988 | Submission | | |
05/09/1988 | Brief Filed | | |
05/09/1988 | Case ready to be set | | |
05/09/1988 | Case ready to be set | | |
04/12/1988 | Brief Filed | | |
04/06/1988 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/01/1988 | Amended Motion Filed to Correct Original Motion | | |
03/23/1988 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
03/09/1988 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/22/1988 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
02/03/1988 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/27/1988 | Amended Motion Filed to Correct Original Motion | | |
01/22/1988 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
12/23/1987 | Motion for Ext Transcript Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/23/1987 | Motion for Extension Statement of Facts Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/23/1987 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |
12/23/1987 | Transcript Filed | | |
12/10/1987 | Amended Motion Filed to Correct Original Motion | | |
12/08/1987 | Miscellaneous filing | | |
12/08/1987 | Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed | | |
12/08/1987 | Motion - Extension to File Transcript filed | | |
11/24/1987 | Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry | | |
10/19/1987 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
10/19/1987 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/07/1989 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Unknown | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Steve W. Simmons |
Unknown | Criminal - Appellant | Hon. Susan Larsen |
Unknown | Criminal - Appellant |
Trial Court Information
243rd District Court
El Paso
Honorable Herb Marsh
48548-243
Life in T.D.C.