judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-1864
A-1864
07/31/1948
Direct Appeal
J. A. DUNCAN, TAX ASSESSOR AND COLLECTOR, ET AL.
HARVEY E. GABLER, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/02/1948Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/19/1948Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
10/13/1948Brief on the MeritsRespondent
07/31/1948Direct Appeal filedPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/13/1948Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief filed
12/02/1948Motion to Argue filed
12/02/1948Additional Copies received
12/02/1948Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/19/1948Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/13/1948Brief on the Merits
07/31/1948Direct Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
J. A. Duncan, Tax Assessor and Collector, et al.Petitioner
Harvey E. Gabler, et al.Respondent
Stanolind Oil and Gas CompanyAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information