judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KNEWITZ VS.8TH JUD DIST CT

Case Information: 33383
Short Caption:KNEWITZ VS.8TH JUD DIST CTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - NONEClassification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/20/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
11/20/1998Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ. 98-00140
02/03/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. fn1 [The clerk of this court shall change the caption in this matter to conform to the caption appearing on this order.] Response due: 20 days from the date of this order. 99-00750
02/23/1999MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Mailed on: FedEx 2/22/99. 99-01216
03/24/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Judgment: " . . . we deny this petition as moot." fn1 We deny as moot the state's request regarding petitioners service of futher papers on the Las Vegas office of the Attorney General. We also deny as moot petitioner's motion for leave to proceed in proper person. SNP99A-WM/DA/NB 99-02119
04/20/1999RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 99-03063
04/20/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.