judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: RONALD A. BUSH v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-07-0226)
Case Number:S-07-0226Case Docketed On:09/28/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Fremont CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: RONALD A. BUSH v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: RONALD A. BUSH, Appellant (Employee/Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Objector/Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRonald A. BushDavid M. Gosar
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
Steven R. Czoschke
Kristi Marie Radosevich
James Michael Causey

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Other, Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2008 WY 117
Citation:193 P.3d 260

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/28/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/28/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/28/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/28/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/28/2007Notice-Incoming - Other received copy of substitution of counselNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
11/15/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
12/26/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/27/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/15/2008Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on diskBriefAppelleeFinal
01/17/2008Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
01/18/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
02/04/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/04/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
02/06/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
02/08/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volume I, original supreme court record from first appeal, 04-191; Volume II, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/07/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/13/2008Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
10/16/2008Event - Hardcopy received - motion for attorney fees and expensesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/04/2008Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
11/04/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/04/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/04/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/04/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/07/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for by Robyn Alexander.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal