judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

STEPHEN KASTNER V. GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY

Case Information: 10-AA-1102
Short Caption:STEPHEN KASTNER V. GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITYClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES01397-10Filed Date:09/03/2010

Opening Event Date:09/03/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/20/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/10/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerStephen Kastner NPro SeN
RespondentGeorge Washington UniversityN
Thomas B. SmithNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/03/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
09/03/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
09/03/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Michael A. Milwee, Esq.
09/09/2010 On consideration of the petition for review in this matter, and it appearing that George Washington University is a business that must be represented by counsel, it is ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 9D.C. 2001); D.C. APP. R. 15 (A)(5). It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). For the Court, Julio A. Castillo, Clerk.
09/30/2010APPEARANCE - of Thomas Smith counsel for the respondent (GWU)
01/20/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD w/ 7/23/10 hearing
01/20/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/08/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
03/29/2011 On consideration of this court's order of February 8, 2011, directing petitioner to file thebrief and the appendix within 40 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this petition for review to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC)
05/05/2011ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW)
05/05/2011DISMISSED
06/10/2011MANDATE ISSUED