Case: B-483
B-483
09/29/1967
Application for Writ of Error
MONTCLAIR CORPORATION
EARL N. LIGHTFOOT PAVING COMPANY, INC., ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/08/1968 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
10/25/1967 | Response to Brief filed | Respondent | | |
10/23/1967 | Supplemental Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
10/13/1967 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
09/29/1967 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/08/1968 | Letter Filed | | ||
02/12/1968 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
02/08/1968 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
10/25/1967 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
10/23/1967 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
10/13/1967 | Response to Petition | | ||
09/29/1967 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
09/29/1967 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Earl N. Lightfoot Paving Company, Inc., et al. | Respondent | |
Montclair Corporation | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information