judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-96-00321-CR
09-96-00321-CR
10/22/1996
ATTEMPTED MURDER
Sangster, Gary Ray
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/10/1997MANDATE ISSUED FROM HIGHER COURT AND CASE STORED
11/10/1997Mandate Issued
08/27/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/19/1997Exhibits Filed
08/13/1997Order Entered
08/11/1997Submitted
08/11/1997Submission
07/01/1997ORAL ARGUMENT WAIVED
06/06/1997Brief Filed
06/06/1997Case ready to be set
04/24/1997Mt file Supplemental Statement of Facts disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/11/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/09/1997Mt file Supplemental Statement of FActs filed
04/09/1997Supplemental Statement of Facts Filed
04/09/1997Supplemental Statement of Facts Received
04/09/1997Brief Filed
04/09/1997Brief received, not filed
04/09/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/27/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/25/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/22/1997Statement of Facts Filed
12/11/1996Transcript Filed
11/19/1996Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
11/18/1996Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
10/22/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
10/22/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/10/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasScott W. Rosekrans
Bates, Laura DeeCourt reporterLaura Wells
Sangster, Gary RayAppellantJudge Tom Brown
Trial Court Information
411th District Court
San Jacinto
Honorable Robert Hill Trapp
7749
60 years