Case Information: 38192 | |||
Short Caption: | POWELL (NORMAN) VS. WARDEN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR94P2447 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/18/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
07/18/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 01-12251 | |
07/27/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 01-12736 | |
08/03/2001 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 01-13160 | |
08/07/2001 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 01-13299 | |
11/21/2001 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: December 26, 2001. | 01-19570 | |
11/26/2001 | Motion | Received Proper Person Motion. Motion to Disqualify Justice Deborah Agosti based on Conflict on Interest. | 01-19709 | |
11/26/2001 | Motion | Received Proper Person Motion. Motion to Allow Appellant to file Pro-Per Appeal and Motion to Remove Attorney of Record. | 01-19711 | |
12/21/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. On November 26, 2001, appellant submitted proper person motions requesting this court to disqualify Justice Agosti from hearing his appeal and allowing him to remove his attorney of record and represent himself in proper person. We note that appellant has not been granted leave to file documents in proper person. Nevertheless, because we resolve appellant's motions, we direct the clerk of this court to file the motions received on November 26, 2001. Appellant has no right to proceed in proper person on appeal. Accordingly, we deny appellant's motion to remove his counsel and allow him to proceed in proper person. Because appellant is represented by counsel in this appeal, we deny appellant's proper person motion to disqualify Justice Agosti from hearing this appeal. Our denial, however, is without prejudice to appellant's counsel's right to file a similar motion, if deemed appropriate. On November 13, 2001, appellant submitted a proper person opening brief. Because we deny appellant's motion to proceed in proper person, we direct the clerk of this court to return, unfiled, the opening brief received on November 13, 2001. Appellant shall address all concerns relating to this appeal to his counsel of record. | 01-21535 | |
12/21/2001 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion to Disqualify Justice Deborah Agosti based on Conflict on Interest. | 01-19709 | |
12/21/2001 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion to Allow Appellant to file Pro-Per Appeal and Motion to Remove Attorney of Record. | 01-19711 | |
12/21/2001 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter. to appellant Norman Tyrone Powell. Returned unfiled, the original and one copy of Appellant's Proper Person Opening Brief, received on November 13, 2001. | ||
12/21/2001 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 01-21563 | |
12/31/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. filed December 21, 2001. Appellant shall file and serve the opening brief and appendix by January 16, 2002. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. | 01-21863 | |
01/15/2002 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 01/15/02 (Reno/Carson). | 02-01039 | |
01/15/2002 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 and 2. | 02-01040 | |
01/15/2002 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Supplemental Appendix. | 02-01041 | |
01/25/2002 | Motion | Filed Motion. Respondent's Motion for Remand. | 02-01773 | |
03/14/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order dismissing Appeal and Remanding. On January 25, 2002, the State filed a motion for remand. The motion is granted. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." fn1[This order constitutes our final disposition of this appeal. Any subsequent appeal shall be docketed as a new matter.] fn2[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP02-MS/RR/NB | 02-04579 | |
04/09/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 02-04860 | |
04/09/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/15/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 11, 2002. | 02-04860 |