judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STEWART TITLE GUARANTY COMPANY, a Texas corporation v. SAMUEL J. TILDEN

Case Heading (S-07-0208)
Case Number:S-07-0208Case Docketed On:09/10/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Insurance Code (Title 26)
Short Title:STEWART TITLE GUARANTY COMPANY, a Texas corporation v. SAMUEL J. TILDEN
Full Title:STEWART TITLE GUARANTY COMPANY, a Texas corporation, Appellant (Defendant), v. SAMUEL J. TILDEN, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantStewart Title Guaranty CompanyAndrea L. Richard
Erika Marie Nash
AppelleeSamuel J. TildenJohn R. Vincent
Jessica Rutzick

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 46
Citation:181 P.3d 94

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/10/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/10/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA received. We were listed on certificate of service faxed from District Court, so no sanction order was issued.Notice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
09/10/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/10/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/29/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/10/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
12/26/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
12/26/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/31/2007Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Justice Golden recused.Notice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
01/08/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, four volumes. Volumes I - III, Original Papers; Volume IV, Transcripts. (See case note)RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/08/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
01/17/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/28/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jessica Rutzick for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/28/2008Event - Phone Call to counsel for appellee; briefs are missing page 4. Requested original plus six copiesEventPhone CallFinal
01/29/2008Notice-Incoming - Correction, missing Page 4 of brief of appelleeNotice-IncomingCorrectionFinal
02/01/2008Order - Assignment of judge - Judge Perry for Justice Golden.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
02/22/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Andrea Richard for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/05/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Voigt, Justices Hill, Kite and Burke and Perry, District Judge (Andrea L. Richard for appellant; Jessica Rutzick for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/05/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/16/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/02/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/02/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/02/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/02/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/08/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal