judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RONALD EUGENE DIXON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1083
Short Caption:RONALD EUGENE DIXON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM586-10Filed Date:08/30/2010

Opening Event Date:08/30/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/15/2010
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRonald Eugene Dixon Y
Kyle A. McGonigalNN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/30/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/14/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Kyle McGonigal, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. For the Court, Julio A. Castillo, Clerk (dfe)
09/14/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Kyle McGonigal, Esquire
10/01/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO REMAND no oppo
10/15/2010ORDER GRANTING APPELLANT MOTION TO REMAND and the case is remanded to the Superior Court for further proceedings consistent with the statements made in appellant's motion. See Smith v. Pollin, 90 U.S. App. D.C. 178, 194 F.2d 349 (1952). It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue the mandate forthwith. (By: ETW)
10/15/2010REMANDED
10/15/2010MANDATE ISSUED
10/22/2010RECEIVED - SR #1 (6pgs/Tape)---8/3/10 proc. Part I (transferred to appeal no. 10-CM-1380)dfe
10/22/2010RECEIVED - SR #2 (162pgs/Tape)---8/3/10 proc. Part II (transferred to appeal no. 10-CM-1380)dfe
10/22/2010RECEIVED - SR #3 (18pgs/Tape)--- 8/4/10 proc. w/cd (transferred to appeal no. 10-CM-1380)dfe
04/17/2014FiledArchived