judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals

Case: 10-96-00233-CR
10-96-00233-CR
10/22/1996
Other Felony
Willie Charles Connor
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/08/1997Case stored
09/08/1997Mandate issued by this Court
07/23/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/11/1997Submitted
06/11/1997Submission
05/22/1997Submission
05/09/1997Brief filed, oral argument not requested
05/09/1997Case ready to be set
04/16/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/09/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
03/19/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/13/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
02/14/1997Brief filed, oral argument not requested
01/15/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/09/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
12/16/1996No Description Available.
12/16/1996No Description Available.
12/04/1996No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
12/02/1996No Description Available.
11/22/1996No Description Available.
10/22/1996Notice of Appeal filed
10/22/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/08/2022Case StoredDestroy case in 25 years.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Connor, Willie CharlesAppellantH. Fred Neale
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasRoy Defriend
Don W. Cantrell
Trial Court Information
77th District Court
Limestone
Honorable H. D. Black
8568-A
9 yrs $5,000 fine