judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals

Case: 13-96-00530-CR
13-96-00530-CR
10/22/1996
Other Felony
Cavazos, Dino
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/17/1998Mandate Recd Ct Crim App / Dt. Clk
08/26/1998Mandate Issued
08/19/1998Cite for opinions
08/11/1998Record returned
07/15/1998Higher Court DecisionRefused
05/22/1998Court of Crim. Appeals Number
05/19/1998Petition for Discretionary Review sent to S.Ct.
05/11/1998Petition for Review
04/09/1998Panel change on case on SMIS or SMIT
04/09/1998Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
10/02/1997Submitted
10/02/1997Submission
09/19/1997Exhibits Filed
09/08/1997Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
09/08/1997Submission
07/17/1997Motion for leave to file Sup. SOF DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Granted
06/26/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/23/1997Motion for leave to file supp. statement of facts
06/20/1997Brief Filed
06/20/1997Brief received.
06/20/1997No oral argument requested
06/13/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/19/1997Brief Filed
05/19/1997Case ready to be set
05/19/1997Oral argument requested
04/03/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/18/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/30/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/16/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/17/1996Statement of Facts Filed
12/17/1996Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
12/05/1996Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
11/18/1996Sworn Statement filed
11/06/1996request for documents
10/22/1996Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
10/22/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
10/22/1996Transcript Filed
10/22/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/26/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasHon. Theodore C. Hake
Hon. Rene A. Guerra
Traci A. Phillips
Cavazos, DinoAppellantJose Antonio Gomez
Hon. Francisco E. Gonzales Jr.
Trial Court Information
206th District Court
Hidalgo
Honorable Benjamin A Martinez
CR-018-96-D
10 yrs TDC