Case: 12-19-00370-CV
12-19-00370-CV
11/08/2019
Miscellaneous/other civil
Gregory D. Holman, d/b/a DNA Auto Trucking
Hibbs-Hallmark & Company
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/20/2020 | Case stored | | |||||||
02/20/2020 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
02/07/2020 | Sent to publisher | | |||||||
01/21/2020 | Petition for review was not filed | | |||||||
12/19/2019 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |||||||
12/04/2019 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed-Want of Jurisdiction |
| ||||||
12/04/2019 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Motion or Writ No Action Taken | | ||||||
11/22/2019 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||||||
11/18/2019 | Fee paid | | |||||||
11/18/2019 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||||
11/08/2019 | Appellant notified that notice of appeal late/show grounds to continue |
| |||||||
11/08/2019 | Case Information Sheet from trial court clerk filed | | |||||||
11/08/2019 | Court packet sent to parties |
| |||||||
11/08/2019 | Fee requested |
| |||||||
11/08/2019 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||||||
11/07/2019 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
10/07/2019 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/20/2020 | Case Stored | Case stored |
02/20/2026 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Holman, Gregory D. | Appellant | Mr. Gregory D. Holman |
Hibbs-Hallmark & Company | Appellee | Mr. Roger W. Anderson |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 2
Smith
Honorable Taylor Heaton
70223-A
Marcie Powell