judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-96-01300-CR
14-96-01300-CR
10/22/1996
Other Drug Sale or Delivery
Calderon, Jaime Lopez
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/10/1999Case stored
04/06/1999Mandate due to be issued
04/06/1999Mandate Issued
04/06/1999Record RETURNED from Higher Court
04/06/1999Mandate Issued
03/10/1999Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
11/30/1998Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
11/13/1998Motion for rehearing DUE
10/29/1998Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
10/29/1998Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
10/08/1998Submitted
10/08/1998Submission
10/08/1998Submitted
09/14/1998Submission
09/25/1997Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/25/1997Case ready to be set
09/25/1997Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
09/25/1997Case ready to be set
09/08/1997Brf.RECD.ARGU.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA
09/08/1997Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/04/1997State's brief DUE
08/07/1997Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
08/07/1997Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
08/04/1997Brf.RECD.ARGU.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA
07/31/1997Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
07/30/1997Appellant's brief DUE
07/03/1997Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
06/30/1997Appellant's brief DUE
06/30/1997Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
05/22/1997Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
05/19/1997Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
05/15/1997Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
05/09/1997Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
05/06/1997Past due brief
05/05/1997Appellant's brief DUE
04/03/1997Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
04/03/1997Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
03/31/1997Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
03/31/1997Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL
03/24/1997No description available.
03/21/1997Statement of Facts Due
01/30/1997Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
01/28/1997No description available.
01/27/1997Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
01/19/1997Statement of Facts Due
12/05/1996Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
11/27/1996Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
11/19/1996Record due
11/19/1996Statement of Facts Due
11/19/1996Transcript FILED
10/22/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/18/1996Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
09/20/1996Date of Sentence
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/06/1999Case StoredCase stored
07/13/2017Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasKevin Patrick Yeary
CALDERON, JAIME LOPEZCriminal - AppellantAlfred G. Leal
Trial Court Information
176th District Court
Harris
Honorable JUAN E. BLACKBURN
727,034
15 Years TDCJ