judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THOMPSON (JOHN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38191
Short Caption:THOMPSON (JOHN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR98P2194Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/17/2001How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/18/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/18/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-12250
08/13/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 38191/38252. 01-13688
08/17/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 01-14017
08/17/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/30/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02Y-CY/DA/ML 01-18188
11/27/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-18206
11/27/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/06/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 30, 2001. 01-18206