judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CLINT PATRICK SCHULER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0207)
Case Number:S-07-0207Case Docketed On:09/10/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:CLINT PATRICK SCHULER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CLINT PATRICK SCHULER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantClint Patrick SchulerR. Michael Vang
Edward Kurt Britzius
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing -Restitution and Other Assessments, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 47
Citation:181 P.3d 929 (Wyo. 2008)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/10/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/10/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/10/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/10/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/18/2007Motion - Withdrawal of counsel, Tom SedarMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
09/18/2007Order - Granting withdrawal of counselOrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
10/25/2007Brief - Appellant; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppellantFinal
11/28/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
12/07/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
12/11/2007Notice-Outgoing - Other - returned designation of record for filing in the trial courtNotice-OutgoingOtherFinal
12/11/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Graham Macdonald Smith for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/13/2007Brief - Appellant reply; received copy of brief on diskBriefAppellant replyFinal
12/14/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/19/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts; Volume III, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/21/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Edward Britzius for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/16/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Edward Kurt Britzius for appellant; Graham Macdonald Smith, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
01/16/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/22/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part. Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/08/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/08/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/08/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/08/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/12/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 5/9/08 by Michelle Crotteau.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal