judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

J. M. FROST, JR., ET AL. v. G. A. BAUMGARTEN, ET AL.

Case: A-267
A-267
07/17/1944
Application for Writ of Error
J. M. FROST, JR., ET AL.
G. A. BAUMGARTEN, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/07/1945Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
03/05/1945Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/01/1945Letter brief Petitioner
12/06/1944Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
10/18/1944Motion for RehearingRespondent
07/26/1944Response to PetitionPetitioner
07/17/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
07/17/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/26/1945Letter Filed
04/07/1945Brief in Support of Petition
03/21/1945Letter Filed
03/12/1945Additional Copies received
03/05/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/01/1945Letter brief
12/16/1944Bond
12/06/1944Brief in Support of Petition
11/22/1944Order from Lower Court filed
11/22/1944Document received (See Remarks)
11/22/1944Document received (See Remarks)
11/22/1944Document received (See Remarks)
11/22/1944Document received (See Remarks)
11/22/1944Document received (See Remarks)
11/22/1944Document received (See Remarks)
11/22/1944Document received (See Remarks)
11/22/1944Document received (See Remarks)
11/22/1944Document received (See Remarks)
11/22/1944Document received (See Remarks)
11/22/1944Document received (See Remarks)
10/18/1944Motion for RehearingFiling granted
07/26/1944Response to Petition
07/17/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/17/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/17/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
G. A. Baumgarten, et al.Respondent
J. M. Frost, Jr., et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information