Case: 14-20-00263-CV
14-20-00263-CV
04/07/2020
Probate
In the Estate of William Moore Kallop, Deceased
No
www.txcourts.gov/14thcoa
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/14/2020 | Mandate issued |
| |||||
07/14/2020 | Judgment Issued |
| |||||
07/14/2020 | Memorandum opinion issued | DISMISSED |
| ||||
07/14/2020 | Motion to dismiss disposed | GRANTED | | ||||
07/14/2020 | Mandate due to be issued | | |||||
07/13/2020 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
07/13/2020 | Submitted | | |||||
07/07/2020 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||||
06/30/2020 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
06/11/2020 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
05/20/2020 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
04/30/2020 | Reporters record filed | | |||||
04/30/2020 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
04/30/2020 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
04/30/2020 | Reporters record due | | |||||
04/22/2020 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
04/22/2020 | Docketing statement due | | |||||
04/17/2020 | Court fee due | | |||||
04/14/2020 | Fee paid |
| |||||
04/13/2020 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
04/13/2020 | Record due | | |||||
04/09/2020 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||
04/08/2020 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed |
| |||||
04/07/2020 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
04/07/2020 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
04/07/2020 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||||
04/02/2020 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
03/16/2020 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/14/2020 | Case Stored | Case stored |
07/14/2026 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
De Kallop, Maria Cristina Newall | Appellant | L. Bradley Hancock |
Brent McKinley Kallop & Brooks Moore Kallop | Appellee | Sarah Elizabeth Patel Pacheco Joe Savoie |
Trial Court Information
Probate Court No 4
Harris
Honorable Judge, Probate Court No. 4
475050
Court Reporter, Probate Court No. 4