judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: AP-72,537
AP-72,537
10/22/1996
Appeal Case Type
HURTADO, EX PARTE OMAR
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/25/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the mandate of a process
04/25/1997MANDATE ISSD
04/09/1997OPINION ISSDHC Relief granted
04/09/1997OPINION ISSDHC Relief granted
11/13/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted of a process
11/13/1996SUBMITTED
10/22/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submission of a process
10/22/1996WRIT FILED
10/22/1996SET FOR SUBMIS
10/22/1996WRIT FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/09/1999STOREDCASE STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn B. Holmes
HURTADO, EX PARTE OMARApplicantDan B. Gerson
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
174th District Court
Harris
Honorable GEORGE H. GODWIN
639432-A