judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-96-00860-CV
04-96-00860-CV
10/22/1996
Miscellaneous civil
The Texas Department of Public Safety
Heriberto Mendoza
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/22/1997Mandate Issued
09/22/1997Mandate Issued
07/23/1997Opinion issuedReversed and Rendered
07/23/1997Opinion issuedReversed and Rendered
06/04/1997Continuation of Information from previous eventMotion or Writ Granted
06/04/1997Motion f/l/file Supp. Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/02/1997Post-Submission Brief Filed
06/02/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
06/02/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
06/02/1997Motion f/l/file Post-Submission brief filed
06/02/1997Post-Submission Brief Received
05/07/1997Submitted
05/07/1997Submission
05/07/1997Submitted
04/28/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
04/28/1997Reply brief filed
03/31/1997Submission
01/10/1997Brief Filed
01/10/1997Case ready to be set
01/10/1997Requests Oral Argument
01/10/1997Case ready to be set
12/17/1996Brief Filed
12/17/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
12/17/1996Requests Oral Argument
12/05/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
12/05/1996No Description Available.
12/04/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
12/04/1996Order Entered
10/24/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
10/24/1996Show cause hearing held
10/22/1996No Description Available.
10/22/1996No Description Available.
10/22/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/10/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
08/28/1996Request for Findings of Fact Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/22/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Dept. Of Public SafetyAppellantCharles R. Maddox
The Honorable John Francis Davis
Heriberto MendozaAppelleeSharon Trigo
Trial Court Information
49th Judicial District Court
Webb
Honorable Solomon Casseb, Jr.
C-95-00603-D1
n/a