judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-96-00861-CV
04-96-00861-CV
10/22/1996
Juvenile
In the Matter of L.J.G., A Juvenile
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/31/1997Mandate Issued
01/31/1997Mandate Issued
11/27/1996Motion to Withdraw Appeal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/27/1996Opinion issuedDismissed
11/27/1996Opinion issuedDismissed
11/12/1996Motion to Withdraw Appeal Filed
10/30/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
10/30/1996No Description Available.
10/30/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
10/30/1996No Description Available.
10/29/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
10/29/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
10/29/1996Show cause hearing held
10/22/1996No Description Available.
10/22/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/31/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
In The Matter Of L.j.g., A JuvAppellantRobert M. Hicks
Unknown UserAppelleeSteven C. Hilbig
Trial Court Information
289th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Paul Andrew Mireles
95-JUV-0386
Unknown at this time.