Case: 05-88-00801-CV
05-88-00801-CV
07/01/1988
Miscellaneous civil
Gihon Foundation
Dallas Central Appriasal District & Dallas County Appraisal
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/27/2016 | Order entered | Destroy | | ||
07/06/2015 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
09/28/1999 | Record Retention | Destroy | | ||
08/18/1988 | Mandate Issued | | |||
08/18/1988 | Mandate Issued | | |||
08/10/1988 | Motion - Ext to File Bond Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
08/10/1988 | Motion for Dismissal Disposed | Dismissed | | ||
08/10/1988 | Motion for Dismissal Disposed | Dismissed | | ||
08/05/1988 | Motion for Dismissal Filed | | |||
07/18/1988 | Response to Motion | | |||
07/07/1988 | Motion for Dismissal Filed | | |||
07/07/1988 | Response to Motion | | |||
07/01/1988 | Motion - Ext. to File Bond | | |||
07/01/1988 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |||
06/29/1988 | Appeal Bond Filed | | |||
03/18/1988 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/27/2016 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
193rd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable John H. Whittington
83-12019-L