judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00450-CR
04-81-00450-CR
02/26/1982
Burglary
Ybarbo, Rudolfo
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/02/1983Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
12/01/1983Mandate Issued
12/01/1983Mandate Issued
11/17/1983Mandate Issued
09/28/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
09/28/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
11/23/1982Motion f/l/file Supp. Authorities Disposed
11/09/1982Motion f/l/file Supp. Authorities Filed
10/28/1982Reply brief filed
10/15/1982Motion f/l/file Supp. Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/13/1982Motion f/l/file Supp. Brief Filed
10/12/1982Supplemental Brief Received
10/12/1982Submission
10/12/1982Submission
10/12/1982Submitted
05/27/1982Motion to Correct Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/25/1982Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
05/25/1982Motion to Correct Brief Filed
05/24/1982Case ready to be set
05/24/1982Brief Filed
05/24/1982Case ready to be set
04/22/1982Brief Filed
03/30/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/19/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
02/26/1982Record Filed
02/25/1982Record Approved
12/30/1981No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
12/28/1981No Description Available.
12/03/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
12/03/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/20/2013Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
12/02/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
290th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable David A. Berchelmann
80-CR-2063-B
Life