judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MILLER VS. COLUMBIA/HCA HEALTHCARE

Case Information: 33399
Short Caption:MILLER VS. COLUMBIA/HCA HEALTHCARECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A386014Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:YoungCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/04/1998 / Macnabb, MarySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:09/12/2000 at 8:30 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:09/12/2000How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/30/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Shirinian & Roitman-check no. 1254.
11/30/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00189
11/30/1998OtherDisqualification of Justice Young. Law firm of Lionel Sawyer & Collins.
12/04/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Mary Macnabb. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
12/14/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 98-00362
12/14/1998Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 98-00364
12/21/1998Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. Respondents' Statement of the Case and Statement of Issues on Appeal. 98-00474
12/24/1998Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Service by Mail of Respondents' Statement of the Case and Statement of Issues on Appeal. 98-00509
02/04/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: March 2, 1999 at 9:30 a.m. at the State Bar Offices, 600 E. Charleston Blvd., Las Vegas. Mailed on: 2/2/99. 99-00814
03/12/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: April 6, 1999. 99-01782
04/15/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: May 18, 1999. 99-02951
05/28/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-04427
06/08/1999Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellants: 70 days to file opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 99-04764
08/17/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: UPS 8/16/99. 99-07660
08/17/1999AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 99-07661
09/14/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: October 20, 1999. 99-08635
10/20/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 10/20/99. Hand delivered. 99-10254
11/08/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: December 22, 1999. 99-10960
12/22/1999BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: UPS Next Day Air-12/21/99. 99-13025
03/10/2000MotionFiled Motion. Petition for Order Accelerating Disposition of Appeal. 00-03813
06/08/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Vacating Argument and Rescheduling. The clerk of this court shall schedule this appeal for oral argument in September, 2000, before the Southern Nevada panel. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. We deny as moot appellants' "Petition for Order Accelerating Disposition of Appeal." 00-09652
07/28/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on September 12, 2000 at 8:30 a.m. in Las Vegas. (SNP00A-RR/WM/NB) 00-13127
08/29/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 00-15147
09/12/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Panel: SNP00A-RR/WM/NB.
12/07/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having considered appellants' contentions and having concluded that they lack merit, " . . . we affirm the judgment of the district court." SNP00A-RR/WM/NB 00-21386
12/27/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100 from Shirinian & Roitman--check no. 2877.
12/27/2000Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Appellants' Petition for Re-Hearing. Mailed on: 12/26/00--UPS. 00-22539
03/28/2001Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." SNP00A-WM/RR/NB 01-05422
04/13/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-05428
04/13/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/11/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 7, 2001. 01-05428