judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RICHARD V. GOSE and CELESTE M. GOSE v. CITY OF DOUGLAS, WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0242)
Case Number:S-07-0242Case Docketed On:10/22/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Converse CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Wyoming State Constitution
Short Title:RICHARD V. GOSE and CELESTE M. GOSE v. CITY OF DOUGLAS, WYOMING
Full Title:RICHARD V. GOSE and CELESTE M. GOSE, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. CITY OF DOUGLAS, WYOMING, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRichard V. Gose Pro Se
AppellantCeleste M. Gose Pro Se
AppelleeCity of Dougals, WyomingRick L. Koehmstedt
Peter James Timbers

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Governmental Claims, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 126
Citation:193 P.3d 1159

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/22/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/22/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/22/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/22/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/30/2007Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
12/06/2007Brief - AppellantsBriefAppellantFinal
12/06/2007Notice-Incoming - Attachment AppendixNotice-IncomingAttachmentFinal
12/06/2007Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
12/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
01/22/2008Brief - Appellee; received copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
01/25/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
02/04/2008Brief - Appellant reply and ExhibitsBriefAppellant replyFinal
02/04/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/06/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
02/08/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, three volumes. Volumes I & II, Original Papers; Volume III, TranscriptRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/08/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
02/20/2008Event - Other - On 2/19/08, the court received three copies of a book called The Israel Lobby. At court's direction, returned to Barnes & Noble, and sent letter to appellant advising that the books were returned and will not be considered.EventOtherFinal
02/25/2008Notice-Incoming - Other - received "Notice of Barnes and Noble Books for the Library of the Wyoming Supreme Court." Did not file.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
02/25/2008Correspondence - Outgoing other - returned Notice of Barnes and Noble Books for the Library of the Wyoming Supreme Court with letter referencing return of books.CorrespondenceOutgoing otherFinal
06/04/2008Motion - Other. Motion for amendment by interlineation of the appellants' brief.MotionOtherFinal
06/20/2008Response/Objection - Motion for AmendmentResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
06/24/2008Order - Denying appellants' motion to amend brief (order file stamped with wrong date--original order corrected)OrderDenyFinal
07/23/2008Notice-Incoming - Other Request of Wyoming Supreme Court to timely rule on this case before this Supreme CourtNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
10/13/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing and remanding in part, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/30/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/30/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/03/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 10/31/08 by Misty Benavides.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal