judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

POTOMAC ELECTRIC POWER CO. V. DC PUBLIC SERVICE COMM'N

Case Information: 10-AA-1118
Short Caption:POTOMAC ELECTRIC POWER CO. V. DC PUBLIC SERVICE COMM'NClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Public Service Commission
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:PSC945Filed Date:09/07/2010

Opening Event Date:09/07/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/26/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/30/2010
Argued/Submitted:02/24/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/05/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
IntervenorOffice of the People's CounselN
Barbara L. Burton YN
IntervenorDC Water & Sewer AuthorityN
Robert I. White NN
Nancy A. White NN
PetitionerPotomac Electric Power CompanyN
Kirk J. EmgeNN
Nicholas S. PennYY
RespondentD.C. Public Service CommissionN
Richard A. Beverly NN
Richard S. HerskovitzNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/07/2010PETITION OF APPEAL
09/07/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
09/07/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD and Richard A. Beverly, Esq.
09/15/2010 On consideration of the petition for review regarding a matter before the Public Service Commission, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that this petition for review is hereby expedited. See D.C. Code 34-605(a)(2001). It is F/O that respondent shall within 20 days from the date of this order prepare and transmit the agency record. See D.C. App. R. 17. (ETW)
10/06/2010RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THE RECORD
10/06/2010RECEIVED - record on appeal
10/07/2010NOTICE OF INTENT TO INTERVENE- of Office of the People's Counsel
10/08/2010MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE Water & Sewer Authority (WASA) on behalf of Resp. no oppo
10/08/2010RECEIVED - notice of intent to intervene
10/26/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/26/2010ORD GRANT RESP MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THE RECORD and the Clerk shall file the lodged administrative record. It is (MORE)
10/26/2010ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE and the Clerk shall file the lodged notice of intent to intervene and shall enter the appearance of the District of Columbia Water & Sewer Authority as an intervenor in this matter. It is (MORE)
10/26/2010 F/O that petitioner's brief and the appendix, as required by D.C. App. R. 30(a)(1), shall be filed no later than November 30, 2010, the brief of respondent and intervenors shall be filed on or befor December 30, 2010, and the reply brief of petitioner, if any, shall be filed no later than January 20, 2011. See D.C. App. R. 31. It is F/O that this case shall be placed on the calendar of February, 2011. As these dates have been set to enable the court to schedule this case on this calendar, it is F/O that any requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of extraordinary circumstances. (ETW)
10/26/2010NOTICE OF INTENT TO INTERVENE (DC Water & Sewer Authority)
10/26/2010LETTER TO COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING (Feb. 2011) Emge Beverly Burton White White Kim
11/30/2010PETITIONER'S BRIEF
11/30/2010APPENDIX- vol. I & II
12/13/2010LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING intervenor
12/15/2010LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING Intervenor
12/16/2010CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
12/30/2010INTERVENOR'S BRIEF (OPC)
12/30/2010RESPONDENT'S BRIEF
12/30/2010INTERVENOR'S BRIEF (WASA)
12/30/2010BRIEFS COMPLETED
01/20/2011PETITIONER'S REPLY BRIEF
02/23/2011LETTER - from the Intervenor (DC Water) that Nance A. White will argue the case in place of Robert I. White
02/24/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/24/2011FiledARGUED before Judges Glickman, Oberly, King Nicholas S. Penn, Esq. for the PETITIONER Richard Herskovitz, Esq. for the RESPONDENT Barbara L. Burton, Esq. for the INTERVENOR Nancy A. White for the INTERVENOR
04/12/2011AFFIRMED (MOJ) (Glickman and Oberly, Associate Judges, and King, Senior Judge.)
05/05/2011MANDATE ISSUED