judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals

Case: 10-82-00026-CV
10-82-00026-CV
02/26/1982
Miscellaneous civil
William Holloman
Joe D. Denson, et ux.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/13/2001Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
03/02/1983Case stored
03/02/1983Mandate issued by this Court
09/23/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/09/1982Submitted
02/26/1982Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/13/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
220th District Court
Bosque
41-81