judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-82-00026-CV
09-82-00026-CV
03/01/1982
Contract
Van Meter, Gene et al
Blcok Wholesale Lumber Co.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/29/1982Case stored
09/29/1982Mandate Issued
08/05/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/11/1982Brief Filed
05/03/1982Brief Filed
03/01/1982No Description Available.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/29/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
172nd District Court
Jefferson
E107,050