judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-82-00258-CR
05-82-00258-CR
03/01/1982
Murder
Larry Donnell Lockett
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/09/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
06/10/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/01/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
07/01/1983Letter received
07/01/1983Letter issued by the court
05/24/1983Letter filed
05/20/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/09/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
06/10/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
06/04/1982Reporters record filed
06/04/1982Clerks record filed
03/01/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/20/1983Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lockett, Larry DonnellCriminal - Appellant
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
292nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 292nd District Court
F81-10019-V
Life