judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-1887
B-1887
12/22/1969
Application for Writ of Error
SUSAN QUINIUS
MANUEL M. ESTRADA, JR., MARY SUE POLASEK
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/28/1970Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/20/1970Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/16/1970Supplement to ResponseRespondent
04/14/1970Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
03/18/1970Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
01/06/1970Response to PetitionRespondent
01/05/1970Response to PetitionRespondent
12/22/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/02/1970Response to Motion filed
05/28/1970Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/20/1970Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/16/1970Supplement to Response
04/14/1970Brief in Support of Petition
03/18/1970Amicus Curiae Brief received
01/06/1970Response to Petition
01/05/1970Response to Petition
12/22/1969Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/22/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
David M. Kendall, Jr.Amicus Curiae
Manuel M. Estrada, Jr.Respondent
Mary Sue PolasekRespondent
Susan QuiniusPetitioner
Jerry V. Walker, David J. Beck and Arno W. KrebsAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information