Case: PD-0423-93
PD-0423-93
04/20/1993
PDR Case Type
HAYWOOD, JOHN ROBERT, JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
05/20/1993 | RESPONSE FILED | State | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
10/01/1993 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
09/15/1993 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
09/15/1993 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
05/20/1993 | RESPONSE FILED | | |
04/20/1993 | PDR FILED | | |
04/20/1993 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/08/1993 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
STATE OF TEXAS | State | John C. Vance |
HAYWOOD, JOHN ROBERTJR. | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | Hal E. Turley |
Court of Appeals Information:
05-91-00790-CR
AFF 2-26-93
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
203rd District Court
Dallas
Honorable THOMAS THORPE
F91-40130-P