judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-82-00041-CV
02-82-00041-CV
02/26/1982
Miscellaneous civil
Nichols, William L. and wife Geneva F. Nichols
Maxey, Ora Lee, Indiv. & independent exec.of Estate, et al
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/15/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
05/04/1983Writ DisposedRefused
03/09/1983Writ Filed
02/03/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
01/18/1983Response Filed
01/14/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
153rd District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Ira Sam Houston
153-61153-80