Case: 02-23-00202-CV
02-23-00202-CV
06/12/2023
Miscellaneous/other civil
TRB Lewisville Town Square, LLC and Jason Boso
HRE Lewisville, LLC
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/05/2024 | Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellee |
| ||||
11/06/2023 | Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/29/2024 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
02/22/2024 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||||
02/22/2024 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
02/14/2024 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||||||
01/29/2024 | Set for submission on oral argument |
| |||||||
01/26/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
01/25/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed |
| |||||||
01/05/2024 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
01/05/2024 | Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||||
12/04/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
12/04/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
11/06/2023 | Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||||
10/06/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
10/05/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
09/14/2023 | Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||||||
09/05/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
09/05/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
08/04/2023 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||||
07/26/2023 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||||||
06/23/2023 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||||
06/23/2023 | Fee paid | | |||||||
06/12/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/29/2024 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Boso, Jason | Appellant | Walker S. Young Byron K. Henry |
TRB Lewisville Town Square, LLC | Appellant | Walker S. Young Byron K. Henry |
HRE Lewisville, LLC | Appellee | Lisa C. Tulk Anthony J. Barbieri |
Trial Court Information
442nd District Court
Denton
Honorable Tiffany Haertling
20-8981-442
Court Reporter, 442nd District Court