judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-5394
A-5394
07/07/1955
Application for Writ of Error
S. O. WORKMAN
HUGH FREEMAN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/11/1955Response to PetitionRespondent
07/07/1955Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/02/1956Dissenting opinion issued.
05/02/1956Opinion issued
11/30/1955Letter Filed
10/05/1955Document received (See Remarks)
07/11/1955Response to Petition
07/07/1955Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/07/1955Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hugh FreemanRespondent
S. O. WorkmanPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information