Case: 05-23-00073-CV
05-23-00073-CV
01/23/2023
Contract
Brandon T. Steele
Woodforest National Bank
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/12/2023 | Mandate issued |
| |||||
03/21/2023 | Sent to publisher | | |||||
02/11/2023 | Record due | | |||||
02/07/2023 | Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
02/07/2023 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
01/31/2023 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||
01/31/2023 | Retention time case file will be retained | Destroy | | ||||
01/30/2023 | Submitted | | |||||
01/24/2023 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||||
01/23/2023 | Fee requested |
| |||||
01/23/2023 | Docketing statement filed | ||||||
01/23/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
01/12/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
11/14/2022 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||
10/14/2022 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/31/2029 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
04/12/2023 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Woodforest National Bank | Appellee | David M. Clem Daniel S. Klein |
Steele, Brandon T. | Appellant | Andrew B. Ryan Mitchell R. Garrett |
Trial Court Information
116th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Tonya Parker
DC-22-02568
Lanetta J. Williams