Case: 02-23-00205-CV
02-23-00205-CV
06/13/2023
Injunction
The Guardianship of William Alvin Moncrief, III, An Incapacitated Person
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/14/2023 | Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/08/2024 | Response filed |
| |||||
02/06/2024 | Motion disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
02/06/2024 | Motion filed |
| |||||
02/02/2024 | Order entered |
| |||||
01/31/2024 | Response filed |
| |||||
12/22/2023 | Motion disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
12/21/2023 | Motion filed |
| |||||
12/18/2023 | Order entered |
| |||||
12/13/2023 | Response filed |
| |||||
11/02/2023 | Motion disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
11/01/2023 | Motion filed |
| |||||
10/19/2023 | Order entered |
| |||||
10/16/2023 | Response filed |
| |||||
09/28/2023 | Motion disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
09/26/2023 | Motion filed |
| |||||
09/05/2023 | Letter filed |
| |||||
09/01/2023 | Order issued | Abated |
| ||||
08/31/2023 | Letter filed |
| |||||
08/31/2023 | Letter filed |
| |||||
08/29/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
08/29/2023 | Response filed |
| |||||
08/28/2023 | Response requested by the court |
| |||||
08/25/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
08/25/2023 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||
08/25/2023 | Response filed |
| |||||
08/25/2023 | Motion for temporary relief filed | Motion or Writ No Action Taken |
| ||||
08/14/2023 | Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||
08/08/2023 | Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
07/24/2023 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
06/26/2023 | Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||||
06/26/2023 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||||
06/26/2023 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||
06/23/2023 | Amended notice of appeal filed |
| |||||
06/22/2023 | Fee paid |
| |||||
06/20/2023 | Extension of time to file clerks record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
06/20/2023 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||
06/16/2023 | Extension of time to file clerks record filed |
| |||||
06/13/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/18/2024 | Status | Notice of appeal due in trial court |
08/28/2023 | Motion | Extension of time to file appellees brief |
08/30/2023 | Motion | Extension of time to file appellees brief |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Moncrief, Jr., Richard Wesley | Appellant | David J. Drez, III Jacob T. Fain Zachary Farrar Darla J. Gabbitas |
Condrey, Georgina Moncrief | Appellant | Jacob T. Fain Zachary Farrar David J. Drez, III Darla J. Gabbitas |
Moncrief, Richard W. | Appellant | Steven K. Hayes William R. 'Butch' Korb, Jr. Andrew D. Sims Michael V. Bourland Lisa H. Jamieson William L. Kirkman Natalie Brackett Preston B. Sawyer J. Nathaniel James Graigory B. Fancher Michael V. Fitzpatrick Russell R. Barton Darla J. Gabbitas D. Patrick Long |
Moncrief, Gloria | Appellee | Kate R. Hancock Christian D. Tucker Walker C. Friedman Alexandra W. Albright Jordan M. Parker Jack Price Jr. Sarah Patel Pacheco William J. Boyce Philip A. Vickers Ralph H. Duggins Len A. Wade Joshua R. Flores |
Searcy, Marshall M. | Appellant | Robert J. Myers Steven K. Hayes |
Moncrief, Anna Marie | Appellee | Zachary E. Johnson Dyann McCully James G. Bennett R. Kevin Spencer Matthew Germany Brendan P. Harvell Samuel Sheffer James W. Holliday Blake Spencer H. Allen Pennington Jr. Vaughn L. Bailey |
Trial Court Information
Probate Court No. 1
Tarrant
Honorable Chris Ponder
2021-GD00275-1-A
Court Reporter, Probate Court No. 1