Case: 14-23-00771-CR
14-23-00771-CR
10/20/2023
Manslaughter
Joaquin Adrian Lima
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/01/2024 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
02/29/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
02/15/2024 | Reporters record due | | |||||
02/12/2024 | Motion to substitute attorney filed |
| |||||
01/31/2024 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
01/18/2024 | Reporters record due | | |||||
01/17/2024 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||
01/17/2024 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed |
| |||||
01/03/2024 | Supplemental clerks record filed |
| |||||
12/18/2023 | Reporters record due | | |||||
12/18/2023 | Record due | | |||||
12/12/2023 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||
12/12/2023 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed |
| |||||
12/04/2023 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
10/23/2023 | Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record |
| |||||
10/20/2023 | Trial court clerks certification of record requested |
| |||||
10/20/2023 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||||
10/18/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
10/17/2023 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/12/2024 | Motion | Motion to substitute attorney |
02/29/2024 | Motion | Extension of time to file appellants brief-criminal |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Lima, Joaquin Adrian | Criminal - Appellant | Cary Marshall Faden Chukwuedo Patrick Ngwolo |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Brian Marcus Middleton Jason Travis Bennyhoff Baldwin D. Chin Alison Leigh Bartasi Baimbridge |
Trial Court Information
400th District Court
Fort Bend
Honorable Judge, 400th District Court
22-DCR-098116
Cheryl L. Pierce
20 Yrs. TDCJ