Case: 03-23-00350-CV
03-23-00350-CV
06/12/2023
Trespass
Rickye Henderson, Top & Ball Properties, LLC, and Curtis Meeks
Ali Arabzadegan
No
www.txcourts.gov/3rdcoa
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/10/2024 | Mandate issued | Dismissed for Want of Prosecution |
| ||||||
09/29/2023 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed for Want of Prosecution |
| ||||||
09/28/2023 | Submitted | | |||||||
09/05/2023 | Notice of late brief |
| |||||||
07/25/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
07/24/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
07/03/2023 | Exhibits filed | | |||||||
07/03/2023 | Exhibits filed | | |||||||
07/03/2023 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||||
06/22/2023 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||||
06/22/2023 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||||
06/22/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||||
06/21/2023 | Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record |
| |||||||
06/14/2023 | Fee paid | | |||||||
06/14/2023 | Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record | | |||||||
06/13/2023 | Telephone call received | | |||||||
06/12/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/10/2024 | Case Stored | Case stored |
01/10/2030 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
06/22/2023 | Status | Fee due in this court |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Meeks, Curtis | Appellant | Mr. Matthew Kita Mr. Michael C. Morin Mr. Paul T. Morin |
Top & Ball Properties, LLC | Appellant | Mr. Matthew Kita Mr. Paul T. Morin Mr. Michael C. Morin |
Arabzadegan, Ali | Appellee | Mr. Guillermo Alarcon Mr. David King |
Henderson, Rickye | Appellant | Mr. Paul T. Morin Mr. Rickye Henderson |
Trial Court Information
353rd District Court
Travis
Honorable J. David Phillips
D-1-GN-23-001138
Windy Andersen