Case: 14-22-00881-CV
14-22-00881-CV
11/30/2022
Miscellaneous/other civil
Ronald Scott Catt
Brian Middleton in his Official Capacity as District Attorney of Fort Bend County
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/27/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee |
| ||||
03/07/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/04/2024 | Supplemental clerks record filed |
| |||||
02/26/2024 | Letter filed |
| |||||
01/03/2024 | Submitted | | |||||
11/27/2023 | Set for submission on briefs |
| |||||
10/30/2023 | Appellees brief due | | |||||
10/27/2023 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
10/27/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
10/17/2023 | Supplemental clerks record filed |
| |||||
10/12/2023 | Motion to dismiss disposed | DENIED AS MOOT |
| ||||
10/10/2023 | Document filed |
| |||||
10/06/2023 | Motion filed |
| |||||
09/28/2023 | Order entered |
| |||||
09/28/2023 | Case reinstated | | |||||
09/28/2023 | Motion to dismiss disposed | DENIED | | ||||
09/25/2023 | Supplemental clerks record due | | |||||
09/21/2023 | Supplemental clerks record filed |
| |||||
08/24/2023 | Order entered |
| |||||
07/26/2023 | Notice filed |
| |||||
07/10/2023 | Supplemental clerks record due | | |||||
07/03/2023 | Supplemental clerks record filed |
| |||||
06/08/2023 | Order entered |
| |||||
06/08/2023 | Order entered | DISSENTING |
| ||||
05/26/2023 | Supplemental clerks record filed |
| |||||
05/04/2023 | Supplemental clerks record due | | |||||
04/06/2023 | Appellees brief due | | |||||
04/04/2023 | Order entered | CONCURRING |
| ||||
04/04/2023 | Order issued | ABATED |
| ||||
03/09/2023 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
03/07/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
02/17/2023 | Reporters record due | | |||||
02/07/2023 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
01/18/2023 | Reporters record due | | |||||
01/18/2023 | Record due | | |||||
01/17/2023 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||
01/17/2023 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed |
| |||||
01/17/2023 | Supplemental clerks record filed |
| |||||
01/13/2023 | Letter filed |
| |||||
01/11/2023 | Response filed |
| |||||
12/30/2022 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||||
12/29/2022 | Supplemental clerks record filed |
| |||||
12/28/2022 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
12/15/2022 | Docketing statement due | | |||||
12/12/2022 | Court fee due | | |||||
12/09/2022 | Statement of inability to afford costs filed in the court of appeals |
| |||||
12/09/2022 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
11/30/2022 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
11/30/2022 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
11/30/2022 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||||
11/29/2022 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
10/03/2022 | Request for findings of fact and conclusions of law | | |||||
09/20/2022 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/03/2024 | Submitted | Submitted on briefs |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Middleton, Brian | Appellee | Kevin T. Hedges Andrew Wipke |
Catt, Ronald Scott | Appellant | Ronald Scott Catt |
Trial Court Information
268th District Court
Fort Bend
22-DCV-290442
Marisol Ramos