judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-5411
A-5411
07/15/1955
Application for Writ of Error
WOODMEN OF THE WORLD LIFE INSURANCE SOCIETY
P. E. DICKISON, ASSESSOR-COLLECTOR OF TAXES, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/26/1955Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/06/1955Reply to ResponsePetitioner
09/01/1955Response to PetitionRespondent
07/19/1955Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/13/1955Miscellaneous letter
12/10/1955Miscellaneous MotionRefused
10/26/1955Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/06/1955Reply to Response
09/01/1955Response to Petition
07/19/1955Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
07/19/1955Document received (See Remarks)
07/15/1955Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Woodmen of the World Life Insurance SocietyPetitioner
P. E. Dickison, Assessor-Collector of Taxes, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information