judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MCWHIRTER VS. HARRIS

Case Information: 33411
Short Caption:MCWHIRTER VS. HARRISCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A352187Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/22/1998 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/02/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Woods & Erickson LLP--check no. 6458.
12/02/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00219
12/02/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
12/07/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: 11/25/98. 98-00283
12/17/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 98-00408
12/22/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
12/28/1998Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. 98-00524
03/08/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties are negotiating a settlement of this matter. 99-01616
11/02/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties are negotiating a settlement of this matter. 99-10716
11/17/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant shall have 60 days from the date of this order to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss this appeal or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. 99-11401
01/18/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Joint Status Report and Request for Extension of Time. 00-00727
02/04/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant has 60 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss this appeal or inform this court of the status of this appeal. 00-01784
06/07/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellant has not responded to our February 4, 2000 order. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss this appeal or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. Failure to comply with this order may result in the dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 00-09580
07/05/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Joint Status Report and Motion for Extension of Time. 00-11466
09/28/2000Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Joint Status Report and Request for Extension of Time. 00-17163
10/16/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This matter has been pending on this court's docket since December 2, 1998. Appellant shall have until November 15, 2000 to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss this appeal. If a stipulation or motion to dismiss this appeal is not filed by November 15, 2000, the briefing schedule in this appeal will be reinstated. 00-18277
12/05/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Reinstated. To date, a stipulation or motion to dismiss this appeal has not been filed. Accordingly, the time deadlines for requesting and preparing transcripts and the briefing schedule are hereby reinstated. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file with this court a transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request. Appellant shall have 120 days from the date of this order within which to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 00-21212
12/22/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: August 25, 1997 and November 3, 1997. To Court Reporter: Patsy Smith. 00-22296
02/02/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (Amended Request) Transcripts requested: August 25, 1997. To Court Reporter: Tina Smith. 01-02214
03/02/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: August 25, 1997. Court Reporter: Tina Smith. 01-03888
04/06/2001MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 01-05962
04/23/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. NRAP 42(b) SNP/CLK 01-06835
04/23/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.