Case: 02-23-00029-CR
02-23-00029-CR
02/23/2023
Habeas Corpus - Bail
Ex parte Zachary Dixon Parker
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
06/16/2023 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
04/13/2023 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||||
03/23/2023 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||||
03/22/2023 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||||
03/22/2023 | Set for submission on record only - no briefs filed | | |||||||
03/22/2023 | Submitted | | |||||||
03/20/2023 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed | | |||||||
03/14/2023 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||||||
03/13/2023 | Docketing statement due |
| |||||||
03/13/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
03/09/2023 | Order received from trial court |
| |||||||
03/09/2023 | Amended notice of appeal filed |
| |||||||
03/08/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal filed |
| |||||||
02/28/2023 | Letter issued by the court for lack of jurisdiction or defect |
| |||||||
02/23/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/16/2023 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Parker, Zachary Dixon | Criminal - Appellant | Jeff Kearney Rhett Parham |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Thomas A. Mitchell |
Trial Court Information
43rd District Court
Parker
Honorable Craig Towson
CV23-0098
Court Reporter, 43rd District Court, Parker County