Case: 11-23-00152-CV
11-23-00152-CV
07/06/2023
Contract
Jeff Neely
Midland Community Theater Board of Trustees, Jessi Willman, Josh Sparks, Brad Bullock, Lisa Durgin, Brennan Berry, Jeff Bryden, Kenny Lunda, Brad McGee, Shaun Rainey, Peter Schrenkel, John Wilkinson, Brockett, McNeel & Pocsik LLP, and Paul Mangum
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/05/2024 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellee |
| ||||
02/02/2024 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellee |
| ||||
11/20/2023 | Amended brief filed | Pro Se |
| ||||
09/01/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Pro Se |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/07/2024 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Motion or Writ Denied |
| ||||||||||||||||||||||||||
03/07/2024 | Motion disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||
03/06/2024 | Letter filed |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
03/05/2024 | Response filed |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
02/23/2024 | Motion filed |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
02/20/2024 | Motion filed |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
02/05/2024 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
02/05/2024 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
02/02/2024 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
01/25/2024 | Letter filed |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
01/18/2024 | Letter filed |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
12/14/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||||||||||||||||||||||
12/14/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||
12/14/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||
12/14/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||
12/14/2023 | Letter filed |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
12/14/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
12/14/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
12/12/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
12/12/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
12/08/2023 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
11/20/2023 | Amended brief filed |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
10/30/2023 | Response filed |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
10/20/2023 | Supplemental clerks record filed |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
10/19/2023 | Letter filed |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
10/19/2023 | Telephone inquiry to or from the court | | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
09/14/2023 | Motion to consolidate disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||||||||||||||||||||||
09/11/2023 | Response filed |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
09/11/2023 | Response filed |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
09/11/2023 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
09/11/2023 | Response filed |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
09/08/2023 | Response filed |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
09/01/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
08/30/2023 | Response requested by the court |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
08/23/2023 | Motion to consolidate filed |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
08/02/2023 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
07/28/2023 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
07/14/2023 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
07/14/2023 | Fee paid | | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
07/14/2023 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
07/13/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal disposed | Dismissed as Moot |
| ||||||||||||||||||||||||||
07/06/2023 | Case Information Sheet from trial court clerk filed |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
07/06/2023 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
06/30/2023 | Findings of fact and conclusions of law filed |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
06/30/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal filed |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
06/30/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
06/23/2023 | Document filed |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
06/13/2023 | Document filed |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
05/15/2023 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
04/04/2023 | Judgment signed by trial court judge |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
03/29/2023 | Findings of fact and conclusions of law filed |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
03/29/2023 | Findings of fact and conclusions of law filed |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
03/24/2023 | Document filed |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
03/24/2023 | Document filed |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||
03/24/2023 | Document filed |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/05/2024 | At Issue | At issue |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Durgin, Lisa | Appellee | Angelique S. Weaver Kristi R. Weaber William Tod Mayfield |
Sparks, Josh | Appellee | B. Blue Hyatt Steven C. Kiser |
Wilkinson, John | Appellee | B. Blue Hyatt |
Lunda, Kenny | Appellee | Angelique S. Weaver William Tod Mayfield Kristi R. Weaber |
Willman, Jessi | Appellee | Angelique S. Weaver Kristi R. Weaber William Tod Mayfield |
Brockett, McNeel & Pocsik LLP | Appellee | C. H. (Hal) Brockett Jr. Ryan J. McNeel John M. Kash |
McGee, Brad | Appellee | Kristi R. Weaber William Tod Mayfield Angelique S. Weaver |
Berry, Brennan | Appellee | Angelique S. Weaver William Tod Mayfield Kristi R. Weaber |
Mangum, Paul | Appellee | B. Blue Hyatt Steven C. Kiser |
Rainey, Shaun | Appellee | William Tod Mayfield Angelique S. Weaver Kristi R. Weaber |
Neely, Jeff | Appellant | Jeff Neely |
Wilkinson, John | Appellee | Steven C. Kiser B. Blue Hyatt |
Bullock, Brad | Appellee | Kristi R. Weaber Angelique S. Weaver William Tod Mayfield |
Bryden, Jeff | Appellee | B. Blue Hyatt Steven C. Kiser |
Midland Community Theater Board of Trustees | Appellee | Laine Schmelzer Julie L. Griffis |
Schrenkel, Peter | Appellee | B. Blue Hyatt Steven C. Kiser |
Trial Court Information
142nd District Court
Midland
Honorable David G. Rogers, Judge
CV59205, CV59782
Melissa Crooks, Court Reporter