Case: 05-22-00240-CV
05-22-00240-CV
03/22/2022
Mandamus
In Re: Sarah Catherine Norris Alford and WMC Vista Holdings, LLC
Yes
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/22/2022 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed | Relator |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/20/2022 | Sent to publisher | | |||||
05/23/2022 | Order received from trial court |
| |||||
05/16/2022 | Opinion issued | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
05/16/2022 | Order entered | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
05/16/2022 | Retention time case file will be retained | Destroy |
| ||||
04/08/2022 | Response due | | |||||
03/28/2022 | Order entered | Otherwise Disposed |
| ||||
03/22/2022 | Motion for emergency relief filed |
| |||||
03/22/2022 | Submitted | | |||||
03/22/2022 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/16/2022 | Case Stored | Case stored |
05/16/2028 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Sarah Catherine Norris Alford and WMC Vista Holdings, LLC | Relator | Wendy Ann McMillon |
JP-8 Comm, LLC, JP-25 Washington, LLPJP-44 Mont, LLC, et al | Real party in interest | Mitchell Madden |
Trial Court Information
429th Judicial District Court
Collin
Honorable Jill Willis
429-03896-2021
Cindy Bardwell