judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CARLOS GIRON, ET AL V. JOHN DODDS, ET AL

Case Information: 10-CV-1129
Short Caption:CARLOS GIRON, ET AL V. JOHN DODDS, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Contracts
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB6447-08Filed Date:09/02/2010

Opening Event Date:09/02/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/06/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/24/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCarlos Giron N
Pearl Keng NN
AppellantAlex Giron N
Pearl Keng NN
AppellantC&c General Builders Inc.N
Pearl Keng NN
AppelleeJohn Dodds N
David B. LambNN
AppelleeTeresa Dodds N
David B. LambNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/02/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/23/2010 ORDERED that COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT SHALL, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE hwy this appeal should not be dismissed as either having been taken from a NON-FINAL ORDER as the case remains pendin in the trial court OR because counsel has not properly designated the parties seeking to appeal. See DC Code 11-721 (2001); West v. Morris, 711 A.2d 1269, 1271 (DC 1998), Patterson v. DC No. 08-CV-189)(DC MAY 6, 2010); (BY: ETW)
09/23/2010TMC - OTSC - ROTSC - appellee's response
10/06/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (22-pgs/tape 7/8/10 proc.)w/cd attached (Transferred to 11-CV-37 on 2/9/11)by dwm
10/06/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/08/2010RECORD INDEX
10/13/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - dated 9/23/10
10/20/2010APPELLEE'S REPLY- to response to show cause why appeal should not be dismissed
11/02/2010 ORDERED that the APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED as having been taken from a NON-FINAL ORDER. See DC Code 11-721 (2001);...Further, the order is not otherwise appealable.... (RDWATE) (rl)
11/02/2010DISMISSED
11/24/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived