judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SONDER W. SEYMOUR v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0255)
Case Number:S-07-0255Case Docketed On:11/01/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:SONDER W. SEYMOUR v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:SONDER W. SEYMOUR, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSander W. SeymourDion James Custis
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Search and Seizure -Traffic Stop, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 61
Citation:185 P.3d 671 (Wyo. 2008)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/01/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/01/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/01/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/01/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/29/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant (appellant's name apparently misspelled)MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/29/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/30/2007Event - Phone Call from secretary for appellant's counsel re spelling of appellant's first name. Correct spelling is Sonder, name repeatedly misspelled in District Court pleadingsEventPhone CallFinal
01/04/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/24/2008Event - Phone Call from staff for appellant's counsel re correcting brief. Advised if counsel wants to file an amended brief, he will have to motion the Court. If he brings up the missing attachments to the brief, we can add themEventPhone CallFinal
01/28/2008Notice-Incoming - Attachment - appendix to brief of appellantNotice-IncomingAttachmentFinal
02/13/2008Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and designation of recordBriefAppelleeFinal
02/19/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
03/03/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/04/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
03/12/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, four volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts; Volume III, exhibits; Volume IV, confidential folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/12/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/05/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/23/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/23/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/23/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/25/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal