judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MEYER VS. UNIVERSITY AND COMMUNITY COLLEGE SYSTEM

Case Information: 33412
Short Caption:MEYER VS. UNIVERSITY AND COMMUNITY COLLEGE SYSTEMCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A382619Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/07/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/02/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
12/02/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00220
03/09/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
03/23/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Mark J. Meyer-Albertsons M.O. No. 02535082133.
04/15/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 30 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. 99-02932
05/07/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Vols. 1 through 6. Mailed on 5/5/99. 99-03694
05/07/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/15/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Appellant's dismissal was justified by his use of deception to procure the appointment. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-20038
12/12/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 through 6 this day. 00-20148
12/12/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/11/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 28, 2000. 00-20148