Case: A-2814
A-2814
07/24/1950
Application for Writ of Error
WILLIAM V. WOODWARD, ET AL.
GEORGE S. ANDERSON, FRANK G. SYER, TRUSTEE WALLACE S. SANDERS, TRUSTEE, ISIDORO ORTIZ, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/22/1951 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
02/21/1951 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
02/12/1951 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
12/22/1950 | Brief on the Merits | Petitioner | | |
12/04/1950 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | | |
08/07/1950 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
07/24/1950 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/22/1951 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
03/07/1951 | Opinion issued | | ||
02/21/1951 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
02/12/1951 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
02/07/1951 | Opinion issued | | ||
12/22/1950 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
12/04/1950 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
10/25/1950 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/25/1950 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
08/07/1950 | Response to Petition | | ||
07/24/1950 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
07/24/1950 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
07/24/1950 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Isidoro Ortiz, et al. | Respondent | |
George S. Anderson, Frank G. Syer, trustee Wallace S. Sanders, trustee | Respondent | |
William V. Woodward, et al. | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information