judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-5405
A-5405
07/12/1955
Application for Writ of Error
A. G. HARRIS
W. C. WINDSOR
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/07/1956Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/03/1956Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
10/03/1956Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
03/28/1956Response to Brief filedRespondent
03/26/1956Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
07/16/1955Response to PetitionRespondent
07/12/1955Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/07/1956Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/24/1956Opinion issued
10/03/1956Supplemental Brief filed
10/03/1956Supplemental Brief filed
07/18/1956Document received (See Remarks)
03/28/1956Response to Brief filed
03/26/1956Brief on the Merits
07/16/1955Response to Petition
07/12/1955Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/12/1955Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
W. C. WindsorRespondent
A. G. HarrisPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information